+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Continued to 2021 with substitute in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
- Committee substitute printed to LIS only 20107511D-H1
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104816D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
M. Keith Hodges
Type:
Primary Sponsor