+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 105 (effective 7/1/18)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1366ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 18104827D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1366E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed 18104827D
+ − Votes (8)
February 20, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2018: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 2, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor