+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 7, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0207)
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 207 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1364ER)
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 981491443-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (26-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 981491443