+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 21, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0611)
On April 7, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 611 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1361ER)
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 005502748-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 12, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (23-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 2
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 005502748
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2000: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2000: Reported from Education with amendment (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor