+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Left in Commerce and Labor
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100677D
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor