+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Rehabilitation and Social Services (7-Y 4-N 2-A)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Motion to recommit to committee agreed to
- Recommitted to Rehabilitation and Social Services
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 1-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N 1-A)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB136E
- Printed as engrossed 18102765D-E
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On December 19, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102765D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
+ − Votes (8)
February 23, 2018: Passed by indefinitely in Rehabilitation and Social Services (7-Y 4-N 2-A)
February 20, 2018: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2018: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N 1-A)
January 25, 2018: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor