+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 609 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1359ER)
- Enrolled
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 14-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 16105997D-S1 (83-Y 14-N)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1359S1
- Substitute by Senator Carrico agreed to 16105997D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Floor substitute printed 16105997D-S1 (Carrico)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE(99-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 16103888D
+ − Votes (7)
March 4, 2016: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 14-N)
March 2, 2016: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2016: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2016: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor