+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 9, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 807 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2002 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1358ER)
On February 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 021308748
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2002: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2002: Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor