+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 728 (effective 7/1/13)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1350ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1350ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 4-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104374D-H1
- Amendment by Delegate Albo agreed to
- Motion to refer to Appropriations committee rejected
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1350EH1
- Printed as engrossed 13104374D-EH1
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104374D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 2-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Standards Of Quality
On November 28, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100704D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (10)
April 3, 2013: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 3, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2013: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2013: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N)
January 30, 2013: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor