+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (62)
On May 1, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1026)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 1026 (effective 7/1/96)
On April 10, 1996 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 20, 1996 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1350ER)
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 967999456-H2
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 967999456-H2
- Senate substitute with amendments rejected by conference committee
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senators: Houck, Goode, Williams
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- Delegates: Spruill, Moore, Wardrup
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (37-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on sub. w/amds. (37-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (2-Y 94-N)
- Senate sub. w/amds. rejected by House (2-Y 94-N)
On February 28, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with sub. w/amds. (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub./amds. 967981749-ES1
- Amendments by Mr. Trumbo agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendment by Mr. Edwards agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 967981749-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 967981749-S1
- Reported from Transportation w/sub. (13-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 967966456-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 967966456-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 967966456-H1
- Reported from Tra. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 966490236
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
April 17, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
April 17, 1996: VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (38-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1996: VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (39-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1996: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (37-Y 0-N)
February 29, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (2-Y 94-N)
February 26, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1996: Reported from Transportation w/sub. (13-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1996: Reported from Tra. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor