+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 6, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0245)
On April 4, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 245 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB135ER)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 1-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Trans / Special Grants
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD6308400 (HB135E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Claims with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Claims
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
March 2, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
March 1, 1994: Reported from Finance (14-Y 1-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (21-Y 0-N)
January 26, 1994: Reported from Claims with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor