+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 7, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1053)
On May 6, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 1053 (effective 7/1/96)
On April 25, 1996 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
- Governor's recommendation #2 adopted
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: AGREE TO IN PART (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's #2 recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: AMDT #2 ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: AMDT #1 REJECTED (46-Y 51-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation #1 (46-Y 51-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation #2 (95-Y 1-N)
On April 10, 1996 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1349ER)
On February 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 967222100