+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1999 in Finance (12-Y 4-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 988918204-E
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd. (24-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 988918204
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 1998: Continued to 1999 in Finance (12-Y 4-N)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Finance with amd. (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (57)
Type:
Primary Sponsor