+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0550)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 550 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1346ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 13104888D-S1 (100-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 12-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1346S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104888D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 13104888D-S1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (11-Y 3-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee
On November 21, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101133D
+ − Votes (7)
February 19, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2013: Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 12-N)
February 14, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (11-Y 3-N)
February 5, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2013: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor