+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0161)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 161 (effective 7/1/15 see bill)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/15
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1341ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 15100474D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1341E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
On November 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100474D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 18, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2015: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2015: Reported from Transportation with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2015: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor