+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 19, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0481)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 481 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1340ER)
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 048353208
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2004: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2004: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor