+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0352)
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 352 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB134ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 087827404-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB134E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming
On December 20, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087827404
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 2008: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2008: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2008: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2008: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor