+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0331)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 331 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2020
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1339ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108459D-S1 (97-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 20108459D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1339S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20108459D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (98-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1339H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20105903D-H1
- Read second time
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20105903D-H1
- Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100232D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2020: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2020: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2020: VOTE: (98-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2020: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Terry G. Kilgore
Type:
Primary Sponsor