+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0284)
On March 30, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 284 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1338ER)
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 061334232-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1338E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 061334232
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 7, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor