+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Failed to pass in House
- No further action taken
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by temporarily
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 13105141D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1336S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House 13105141D-S1 (1-Y 94-N 1-A)
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 94-N 1-A)
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Ramadan, Cole, Filler-Corn
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Ruff, Stuart, Vogel
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 13105141D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 38-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (59-Y 38-N 1-A)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 13100524D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1336E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
- Passed by temporarily
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 8-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 1-N)
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends no action (5-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #3
On November 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100524D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
February 13, 2013: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 94-N 1-A)
February 13, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 38-N 1-A)
January 30, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 1-N)
January 30, 2013: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 8-N)
January 25, 2013: Subcommittee recommends no action (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor