+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0578)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 578 (effective 7/1/16)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1336ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 5-N)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N)
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N)
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On November 25, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100703D
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2015: Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N)
February 13, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2015: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 5-N)
February 2, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
January 28, 2015: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor