+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (51)
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 769 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0769)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1333ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Dunnavant, Reeves, Spruill
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Brewer, Orrock, Aird
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 96-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (13-Y 1-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1333E
- Printed as engrossed 18104179D-E
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Presented and ordered printed 18104179D
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
+ − Votes (13)
March 9, 2018: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2018: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2018: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
March 5, 2018: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (13-Y 1-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor