+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 1, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1024)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 1024 (effective 7/1/96)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (98-Y 1-N)
On April 10, 1996 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1333ER)
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 9-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (91-Y 9-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 7, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Committee amendments rejected
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 964143180-E
- Amendment by Mr. Croshaw agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 964143180
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (8)
April 17, 1996: VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (38-Y 0-N)
April 17, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
February 20, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 9-N)
February 16, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1996: Reported from General Laws with amd. (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1996: Reported from General Laws with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor