+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 4-N)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (57-Y 43-N)
- Read third time and passed House (57-Y 43-N)
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 22103697D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1331E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (13-Y 7-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 22103697D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 15, 2022: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 43-N)
February 9, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor