+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 20, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0638)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 638 (effective 1/1/05)
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1330ER)
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Reading of amendment waived
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amd (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 047369420-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1330E
- Amendments by Del. Nixon agreed to
- Committee amendment No. 2 agreed to
- Committee amendment No. 1 rejected
- Read second time
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 047369420
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (8)
March 8, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2004: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2004: Reported from General Laws with amd (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2004: Reported from General Laws with amds (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor