+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0806)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 806 (effective 7/1/14)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
- VOTE: REJECTED (31-Y 65-N)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation (31-Y 65-N)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB133ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senators: Hanger, Lucas, Colgan
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Delegates: Cole, Greason, Joannou
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (15-Y 85-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 14105275D-S1 (15-Y 85-N)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB133S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14105275D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14105275D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB133H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14103937D-H1
- Read second time
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14103937D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101459D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (12)
April 23, 2014: VOTE: REJECTED (31-Y 65-N)
March 8, 2014: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2014: Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2014: VOTE: REJECTED (15-Y 85-N)
February 28, 2014: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2014: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2014: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2014: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor