+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 14, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0813)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB133ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Gov's recom. (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 813 (effective-see bill)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB133ER)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (26-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 982069416
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (26-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor