+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0876)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 876 (effective 7/1/94)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Amended as substitute by Governor's recommendation
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed LD7244812 (HB133H2)
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB133ER)
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD7934244 (HB133H1)
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed