+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0293)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 293 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB133ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 12100824D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB133E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 4, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100824D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2012: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2012: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2012: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor