+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 18, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0731)
On April 10, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 731 (effective 7/1/94)
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 25, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1327ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: RECEDE (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate receded from amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 97-N)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (13-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD1303350 (HB1327E)
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional readings dispensed
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: RECEDE (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (13-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: Reported from C. J. with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor