+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0283)
On March 30, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 283 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1327ER)
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 6-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 6-N 1-A)
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 063263844
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2006: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 6-N 1-A)
January 27, 2006: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor