+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2019 in Privileges and Elections (13-Y 1-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House (91-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (91-Y 6-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 1-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Presented and ordered printed 18104717D
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2018: Continued to 2019 in Privileges and Elections (13-Y 1-N)
February 1, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
February 1, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (91-Y 6-N)
January 26, 2018: Reported from Privileges and Elections (19-Y 1-N)
January 23, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor