+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (72)
On April 27, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0951)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 951 (effective 7/1/94)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (33-Y 5-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (33-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec.. of Gov's recommendation agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 9-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (90-Y 9-N)
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1322ER)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 3-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 3-N)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (36-Y 3-N)
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Senate substitute accepted by conference committee
- Amended by conference committee
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senators: Holland, C.A., Howell, Stosch
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Delegates: Brickley, Bennett, Bloxom
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute rejected by House (45-Y 51-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (45-Y 51-N)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 6-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 6-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD5361743 (HB1322S1)
- Reported from R. & S. S. with sub. (12-Y 3-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD4374136 (HB1322EH2)
- Engrossed by House-committee substitute/with amds.
- Amendments by Del. Bennett agreed to
- Title replaced
- Amendments by Del. Brickley agreed to
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD4374136 (HB1322H2)
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD4374136 (HB1322H1)
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 3
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (15)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (33-Y 5-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 9-N)
March 12, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (36-Y 3-N)
March 12, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 3-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED (45-Y 51-N)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 6-N)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1994: Reported from R. & S. S. with sub. (12-Y 3-N)
February 23, 1994: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N)
February 12, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1994: Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor