+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Referred from Education by voice vote
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103127D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsor
Kaye Kory
Type:
Primary Sponsor