+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0562)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 562 (effective 7/1/15)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1320ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 2-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1320H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104127D-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104127D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
On November 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100233D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2015: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2015: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N)
February 4, 2015: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor