+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 630 (effective 3/26/15)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1319ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 15101038D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1319E
- Emergency clause added
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3
On November 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101038D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2015: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2015: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2015: Reported from Transportation with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor