+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 18, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0730)
On April 10, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 730 (effective-see bill)
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 25, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1318ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Senate substitute rejected by House (43-Y 49-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (43-Y 49-N)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reconsider motion to insist & request (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Senate receded from substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECEDE FROM SENATE AMDT. (40-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 3-N)
- Read third time
- Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 3-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (35-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 4-N)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD9602350 (HB1318S1)
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (13-Y 2-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 9-N)
- Read third time and passed House (80-Y 9-N)
- Printed as engrossed LD4088812 (HB1318E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Constitutional readings dispensed
- Reported from Appropriations with amd. (20-Y 1-N)
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 10-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: RECEDE FROM SENATE AMDT. (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED (43-Y 49-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 3-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 4-N)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (13-Y 2-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 9-N)
February 15, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with amd. (20-Y 1-N)
February 14, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 10-N)
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor