+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (51)
On April 27, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0950)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 950 (effective 7/1/94)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (24-Y 14-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (24-Y 14-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 25, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1317ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: RECEDE FROM SENATE AMDT. (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate receded from amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsider motion to insist & request (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (45-Y 55-N)
- Senate amendments rejected by House (45-Y 55-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Placed on Calendar
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (13-Y 1-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD3348812 (HB1317E)
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed House (88-Y 5-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Constitutional readings dispensed
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (20-Y 1-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (12)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (24-Y 14-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED (45-Y 55-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: RECEDE FROM SENATE AMDT. (39-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (13-Y 1-N)
February 15, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (20-Y 1-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 5-N)
February 15, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor