+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 128 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0128)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1310ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106695D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1310H1
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106695D-H1
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Presented and ordered printed 18103965D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor