+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (65)
On May 14, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB131ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recom. (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 812 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB131ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 985474633-H2
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by conference committee
- House substitute rejected by conference committee
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 98547633
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 985448296-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 985448296-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House (2-Y 90-N)
- House acceded to request
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Cranwell, Parrish, DeBoer, Rust
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Colgan, Howell, Miller, K.G., Trumbo
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (2-Y 90-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 985448296-S1
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 989694296-H1
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989694296-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989694296-H1
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub. (23-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 985973296
- Referred to Committee on Finance