+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0155)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 155 (effective 7/1/18)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1308ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 1-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 18104164D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1308E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 18104164D
+ − Votes (8)
February 20, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2018: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N)
January 31, 2018: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor