+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 4, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0973)
On April 9, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 973 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 14, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1307ER)
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 009221204-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 009221204-H1
- Read second time
On February 12, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 009221204-H1
On February 10, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture w/substitute (19-Y 3-N)
On February 7, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture sub-committee: 2
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 001645204
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2000: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2000: Reported from Agriculture w/substitute (19-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor