+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311)
On April 8, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 311 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1306ER)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Printed as engrossed 984926340-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (24-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 984926340
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1998: Reported from R. & S. S. (15-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: Reported from C. J. with amendments (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor