+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2003 in General Laws by voice vote
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 38-N)
- Read third time and passed House (61-Y 38-N)
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (61-Y 38-N)
- Engrossed by House (61-Y 38-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (44-Y 53-N)
- Amendment by Del. Drake rejected (44-Y 53-N)
- Read second time
On February 9, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N)
On January 25, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 1
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 021310748
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 38-N)
February 11, 2002: VOTE: REJECTED (44-Y 53-N)
February 11, 2002: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (61-Y 38-N)
February 7, 2002: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor