+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Delegates: Simon, Freitas, Cordoza
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators: Ebbin, McClellan, Stanley
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (31-Y 9-N)
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House 22106765D-S1 (0-Y 99-N)
- VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 99-N)
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 18-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1306S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22106765D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 22106765D-S1
- Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (94-Y 3-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 3-N 1-A)
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 22105993D-EH1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1306EH1
- Amendment by Delegate Simon agreed to
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105993D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1306H1
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22105993D-H1
- Reported from Public Safety with substitute (17-Y 4-N)
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 3-N)
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Public Safety
- Presented and ordered printed 22104748D
+ − Impact Statements (8)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (8)
March 1, 2022: Senate insisted on substitute (31-Y 9-N)
February 25, 2022: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 99-N)
February 23, 2022: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 18-N 1-A)
February 22, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2022: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
February 11, 2022: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 3-N 1-A)
February 4, 2022: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (17-Y 4-N)
February 3, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor