+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 12, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0902)
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 902 (effective 7/1/99)
On February 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1305ER)
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Title replaced
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (94-Y 4-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendments (32-Y 8-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (33-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (33-Y 6-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (32-Y 8-N)
On February 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amds. (9-Y 6-N)
On January 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 18-N)
- Read third time and passed House (82-Y 18-N)
On January 25, 1999 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 986352340-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Mr. Robinson agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Read second time
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 20, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 18, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 15, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 14, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On December 22, 1998 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 986352340
On December 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amd. (21-Y 2-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Tra. (26-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 3
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 986352340
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
February 17, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N)
February 15, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (32-Y 8-N)
February 15, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 1-N)
February 15, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (33-Y 6-N)
February 12, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1999: Reported from Transportation w/amds. (9-Y 6-N)
January 26, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 18-N)
December 17, 1998: Reported from Tra. w/amd. (21-Y 2-N)
February 10, 1998: Continued to 1999 in Tra. (26-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor