+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 17, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0520)
On March 10, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 520 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1305ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1305H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 080187652-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 080187652-H1
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: 1
On January 9, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084031652
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2008: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2008: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor