+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 297 (effective 7/1/17)
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/16
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1299ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 16104052D