+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 19, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 477 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1299ER)
On March 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 14, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from M., P. & P. S. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed 049538548