+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (67)
On April 14, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
On April 9, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 589 (effective 7/1/94)
On April 2, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 24, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1294ER)
On March 14, 1994 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed LD9138176 (HB1294H2)
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: RULING OF THE CHAIR (99-Y 1-N)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Motion for pending question rejected
- Ruling of the chair sustained (99-Y 1-N)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N)
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Substitute recommended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (73-Y 25-N)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (35-Y 5-N)
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by conference committee
- VOTE: ADOPTION (73-Y 25-N)
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senators: Colgan, Cross, Chichester
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Delegates: Cranwell, Jackson, Miller
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 94-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (2-Y 94-N)
On February 25, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 3-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD7208605 (HB1294S1)
- Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (49-Y 47-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Amendment by Del. Jackson rejected (49-Y 49-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (49-Y 49-N)
- Amendments by Del. Scott rejected (43-Y 53-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (43-Y 53-N)
- Amendment by Del. Jackson reconsidered (49-Y 47-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 48-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Amendment by Del. Jackson agreed to (50-Y 48-N)
- Amendments by Del. Councill agreed to
- Amendments by Del. Mims agreed to
- Amendment by Del. Robinson agreed to
- Engrossed by House-committee substitute with amds.
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Printed as engrossed LD7178168 (HB1294EH1)
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD7178168 (HB1294H1)
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (15-Y 7-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (14)
March 12, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (35-Y 5-N)
March 12, 1994: VOTE: RULING OF THE CHAIR (99-Y 1-N)
March 12, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (73-Y 25-N)
March 2, 1994: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 94-N)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 3-N)
February 23, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1994: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (49-Y 47-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 48-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED (43-Y 53-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED (49-Y 49-N)
February 12, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (15-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor